Harrison v. Executive Office for United States Attorneys
Plaintiff: David Scott Harrison
Defendant: Executive Office for United States Attorneys
Case Number: 3:2016cv01310
Filed: May 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court grants Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 21). The Order (ECF No. 26) ends the litigation in this matter.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying Defendant's 11 Motion for Summary Judgment. It is ordered that defendant shall file a renewed motion for summary judgment, if any, on or before thirty (30) days from the date on which this Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/30/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 10 Motion for Leave to Take Discovery from Defendant. Plaintiff seeks leave to conduct discovery to obtain the records he believes he has been improperly denied under FOIA. Plaintiff is not entitled to this discovery at this stage of the case. Therefore, the Motion for Leave to Take Discovery is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/16/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: (1) granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, and (2) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Summons and Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. T he Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/21/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Executive Office for United States Attorneys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Scott Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for United States Attorneys
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?