Nasery v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Rahima Nasery
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv01534
Filed: June 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Regarding Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs [Doc. No. 22 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/21/2017. (jjg)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: Here, neither party has timely filed objections to Magistrate Judge Crawfords R&R. Having reviewedthe R&R, the Court finds that it is thorough, well-reasoned, and contains no clear error. Accordin gly, the Court hereby: (1) ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Crawfords report and recommendation; (2) GRANTS Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment; (3) DENIES Defendants cross-motion for summary judgment; and (4) REMANDS the matter to the Commissioner for further consideration, investigation, and development of the record consistent with the R&R. This Order concludes the litigation in this matter. The Clerk shall CLOSE the file. IT IS SO ORDERED.(jjg)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Re Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment [Doc. Nos. 14 , 16 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/4/2017. (jjg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasery v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahima Nasery
Represented By: Alexandra T. Manbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Represented By: Brenda M. Pullin
Represented By: Thomas C Stahl
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?