Profil Institut fur Stoffwechselforschung GmbH v. Profil Institute for Clinical Research, Inc.
Plaintiff: Profil Institut f r Stoffwechselforschung GmbH
Defendant: Profil Institute for Clinical Research, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01549
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause; and Order Granting In Part and Denying Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 17 ). Profil can amend within 21 calendar days of the date this order. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/31/2017. (rlu)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 36 Ex Parte Motion for Reconsideration; and Admonition to Counsel. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/1/2017. (fth)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, denying as moot 30 Motion to Shorten Time. This order does not prevent ProSciento from seeking a preliminary injunction in the future, in the event it files a complaint or counterclaim. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/27/17. (kas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Profil Institut fur Stoffwechselforschung GmbH v. Profil Institute for Clinical Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Profil Institut f r Stoffwechselforschung GmbH
Represented By: Armin Azod
Represented By: Gunnar B. Gundersen, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Profil Institute for Clinical Research, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Michael Stiegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?