Millare v. Stratton et al
Plaintiff: Moriano Millare
Defendant: G. Stratton, A. Limon, G. Charlton, O. Shelland, S. Corcoran, F. Fernandez, T. Vasquez, D.R. Brown, H. Asbury, C. Moore, R. Olsen, R. Olivarria, B. Baeziger, B. Self, V. Sosa, Doe and K.A. Seibel
Case Number: 3:2016cv01633
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 55 MOTION to Dismiss filed by A. Limon. Court recommends that: 1.) Defendant's Motion be denied as to Plaintiff's First Amendment retaliation claim (count one), 2.) Defendant's Motion be granted with prejudice as to Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim (count twelve), 3.) Defendant's Motion be granted with prejudice as to Plaintiff's state law claims (counts thirteen, fourteen, and fifteen). Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2017. Replies due by 11/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/30/2017. (jah)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 50 Motion to Compel a More Definite Answer. If, after making a good faith effort to meet and confer regarding specific challenges Plaintiff asserts against Defendants' objections, the parties reach an impasse, the parties may file a Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute by 10/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/15/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by G. Stratton, R. Olivarria, C. Moore, B. Baeziger, J. Corcoran, G. Charlton, B. Self, F. Fernandez, O. Shelland, K.A. Seibel, R. Olsen, T. Vasquez , V. Sosa, H. Asbury. Court recommends that Dfts' Motion be granted with prejudice as to Pla's Eighth Amendment claim against all Dfts (count twelve) and Dfts' Motion be granted with prejudice as to Pla's state law claims against Dft Corcoran (counts thirteen, fourteen, and fifteen). Objections to R&R due by 6/13/2017. Replies due by 6/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 5/23/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Court adopts 30 Report and Recommendation in its entirety. Granting in part and denying in part Defendants R. Olsen, F. Fernandez, H. Asbury, G. Stratton, G. Charlton, T. Vasquez, C. Moore, B. Self, B. Baen ziger, R. Olivarria, K.A. Seibel, and V. Sosa's 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, which was joined by Defendant O. Shelland 21 . Court denies Dfts R. Olsen, R. Olivarria, B. Baenziger, B. Self, and V. Sosa's request to dismiss Pla's tenth count for First Amendment retaliation. Court denies Dfts K.A. Seibel and G. Stratton's request to dismiss Pla's eleventh count for First Amendment retaliation. Court grants Dft R. Olsen, F. Fernandez, H. Asbury, G. Stratton, G. Charlton, T. Vasquez, C. Moore, B. Self, B. Baenziger, R. Olivarria, K.A. Siebel, V. Sosa, and O. Shelland's request to dismiss with prejudice Pla's twelfth count for violation of the Eighth Amendment. Court dismisses Pla' s twelfth count against Dfts without leave to amend. Court grants Dfts R. Olsen, F. Fernandez, H. S. Asbury, G. Stratton, G. Charlton, T. Vasquez, C. Moore, B. Self, B. Baenziger, R. Olivarria, K. A. Seibel, V. Sosa, and O. Shelland's request to dismiss with prejudice Pla's thirteenth, fourteenth, and fifteenth counts for violation of state law. Court dismisses Pla's thirteenth, Fourteenth, and fifiteenth counts against Dfts witiout leave to amend. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/5/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millare v. Stratton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moriano Millare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Limon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Charlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Shelland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Asbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Olivarria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Baeziger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Self
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.A. Seibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?