Brightwell v. McMillan Law Firm, APC The et al
Plaintiff: L. Lee Brightwell
Defendant: McMillan Law Firm, APC, Scott A. McMillan, Michelle D. Volk and Does 1 through 25
Case Number: 3:2016cv01696
Filed: June 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 85 Ex Parte Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/13/2018. (jao)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 80 Joint Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 11/29/2017. (mxn) (sjt).
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [DOC. 71 ]. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 11/20/2017. (lrf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2017: # 1 Stricken Document) (lrf).
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 68 Ex Parte Application to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Joshua Michael Heinlein terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 10/11/2017. (ajs)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Denying 62 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File A Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 9/28/2017. (jao)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER; (1) granting in part and denying in part 18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; and (2) granting in part and denying in part 19 Defendants' Motion to Strike. Plaintiff will have leave to amend the FAC. She must file any amended complaint on or before Tuesday, May 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 5/2/2017. (jao)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brightwell v. McMillan Law Firm, APC The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. Lee Brightwell
Represented By: Joshua Michael Heinlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMillan Law Firm, APC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A. McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle D. Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?