Wallace v. Olivarria et al
Plaintiff: |
Tyrone Wallace |
Defendant: |
R. Olivarria, B. Self, R. Armendariz, J. McNeil and D. Arguilez |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv01808 |
Filed: |
July 12, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Cynthia Bashant |
Presiding Judge: |
Peter C. Lewis |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 8, 2017 |
Filing
25
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 22 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Court dismisses Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for failing to state a claim upon which 1983 relief may be granted pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(b). Court denies Plai ntiff further leave to amend as futile. Court certifies that an appeal for this final Order of dismissal would be frivolous, and therefore, not taken in good faith pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a)(3). Clerk is directed to terminate this civil action and close the file. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/8/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
|
October 21, 2016 |
Filing
19
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and 18 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying Plaintiff's 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to c ollect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Court dismisses this action for failing to state claim upon which 1983 relief can be granted pursuant to 28 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and 1 915A(b)(1). Court grants Plaintiff 45 days leave from the date of this Order to re-open the case by filing an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant. (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Blank 1983 Complaint form t/w copy of the Order mailed to Plaintiff) (jah)
|
August 11, 2016 |
Filing
7
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/11/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?