Expo Fresh, LLC v. Western Repacking LLP et al
Plaintiff: Expo Fresh, LLC
Defendant: Western Repacking LLP, Western Repacking, LLLP, Lipman-Portland, Produce Exchange Inc. and Lipman Produce, Inc.
Cross Defendant: DOES 1 through 50
Case Number: 3:2016cv01881
Filed: July 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #29 Joint Motion to Dismiss Action in its Entirety with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/7/2018.(jdt)
May 2, 2018 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Action in its Entirety with Prejudice by Expo Fresh, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ayers, Jimmy) (jdt).
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Confirming Settlement and Setting Deadline to File Joint Motion for Dismissal. Because the case has settled, all other pending dates before Magistrate Judge Major are hereby vacated. Any matters currently scheduled before the district judge shall remain in effect pending notice from that court. The parties are ordered to file their joint motion for dismissal of this case no later than 5/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/23/2018.(jdt)
February 22, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Settlement of Entire Case by Expo Fresh, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ayers, Jimmy) (jdt).
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Joint Motion for Protective Order With Modifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/4/2017. (jdt)
December 1, 2017 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Expo Fresh, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ayers, Jimmy) (jdt).
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings:A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 5/11/2018 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 1/7/2019. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/14/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Larry Alan Burns. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/2/2017.(lrf)
November 2, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jihee Ahn on behalf of Lipman-Portland, Produce Exchange Inc., Western Repacking, LLLP (Ahn, Jihee)Attorney Jihee Ahn added to party Lipman-Portland(pty:dft), Attorney Jihee Ahn added to party Produce Exchange Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jihee Ahn added to party Western Repacking, LLLP(pty:dft), Attorney Jihee Ahn added to party Western Repacking, LLLP(pty:crc) (lrf).
November 1, 2017 Filing 22 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major:Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 11/1/2017. Case did not settle. Case Management Conference held on 11/1/2017. Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Morgan Scudi and Ray Ayers).(Defendant Attorney Jihee Ahn). (no document attached) (asm)
October 23, 2017 Filing 21 ANSWER to #17 Crossclaim by Expo Fresh, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ayers, Jimmy) (lrf).
October 23, 2017 Filing 20 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Expo Fresh, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ayers, Jimmy) (lrf).
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Resetting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. The Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference originally scheduled for 11/2/2017 at 1:30 PM is reset to 11/1/2017 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. All other guidelines and requirements remain in effect. (See ECF No. #18 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/4/2017. (lrf)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/2/2017 at 01:30 p.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2017 at 01:30 p.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Joint Discovery Plan to be filed on the CM/ECF system no later than 10/23/2017. Absent good cause, requests for continuances will not be considered unless submitted in writing no fewer than seven (7) days prior to the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 09/26/2017.(ajs)
September 25, 2017 Filing 17 CROSSCLAIM against Expo Fresh, LLC, filed by Western Repacking, LLLP. (Pearson, Matthew) (ajs).
September 25, 2017 Filing 16 Defendants' ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Western Repacking, LLLP, Produce Exchange Inc., Lipman-Portland.(Pearson, Matthew) (ajs).
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #5 Joint Motion to Continue Response Deadline; and Order Denying #7 Motion to Dismiss or Stay. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/11/2017. (lrf)
November 8, 2016 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lipman-Portland, Produce Exchange Inc., Western Repacking, LLLP re #12 Reply to Response to Motion (Pearson, Matthew) (kas).
November 7, 2016 Filing 13 Minute Entry by Chambers of Judge Larry Alan Burns: Currently on calendar for Monday, November 14, 2016 at 11:15 a.m. is a hearing on Defendants' motion to dismiss or stay #7 . Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1), the Court finds this motion suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing on this motion is taken off calendar and this matter is taken under submission. No appearances will be required in this matter on November 14, 2016. (Court Reporter/ECR N/A). (Plaintiff Attorney No appearance). (Defendant Attorney No appearance). (kas)
November 7, 2016 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay the Action filed by Lipman-Portland, Produce Exchange Inc., Western Repacking, LLLP. (Pearson, Matthew) (kas).
October 31, 2016 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay the Action filed by Expo Fresh, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Counsel, #3 Proof of Service)(Ayers, Jimmy) (kas).
September 19, 2016 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lipman-Portland, Produce Exchange Inc., Western Repacking, LLLP re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay the Action (Pearson, Matthew) (kas).
September 19, 2016 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Expo Fresh, LLC. Western Repacking, LLLP served. (Scudi, Morgan) (kas).
September 19, 2016 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Expo Fresh, LLC. Lipman-Portland served. (Scudi, Morgan)(kas).
September 16, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay the Action by Lipman-Portland, Produce Exchange Inc., Western Repacking, LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice)(Pearson, Matthew)Attorney Matthew D. Pearson added to party Lipman-Portland(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D. Pearson added to party Produce Exchange Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D. Pearson added to party Western Repacking, LLLP(pty:dft). Added MOTION to Stay on 9/19/2016 (kas).
September 6, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Expo Fresh, LLC. Produce Exchange Inc. served. (Ayers, Jimmy) (kas).
August 30, 2016 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Continue Response Deadline to September 16, 2016 by Lipman Produce, Inc., Produce Exchange Inc., Western Repacking, LLLP. (Chow, Teresa) Attorney Teresa Carey Chow added to party Lipman Produce, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Teresa Carey Chow added to party Produce Exchange Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Teresa Carey Chow added to party Western Repacking, LLLP(pty:dft) (kas).
August 16, 2016 Filing 4 Summons issued on an Amended Complaint as to Lipman-Portland, Western Repacking, LLLP. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc) Modified on 8/16/2016 (acc).
August 15, 2016 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Produce Exchange Inc., Western Repacking, LLLP, Lipman-Portland, LLC, filed by Expo Fresh, LLC.New Summons Requested. (Scudi, Morgan)(acc).
July 26, 2016 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dxj) (jao).
July 25, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lipman Produce, Inc., Produce Exchange Inc., Western Repacking LLP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9266211.), filed by Expo Fresh, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:16-cv-1881-LAB-BLM. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Scudi, Morgan)(dxj) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Expo Fresh, LLC v. Western Repacking LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Repacking LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Repacking, LLLP
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Represented By: Matthew D. Pearson
Represented By: Jihee Ahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lipman-Portland
Represented By: Matthew D. Pearson
Represented By: Jihee Ahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Produce Exchange Inc.
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Represented By: Matthew D. Pearson
Represented By: Jihee Ahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lipman Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Expo Fresh, LLC
Represented By: Jimmy Ray Ayers, Jr
Represented By: Morgan JC Scudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: DOES 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?