Mendez v. Optio Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Mendez
Defendant: Optio Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv01882
Filed: July 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying as moot 45 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; denying 47 Motion for Discovery. The Court DENIES the Motion WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Accordingly, plaintiffs Motion to File Documents Under Seal is MOOT. The Parties have five (5) days to meet and confer, and refile their Motion with the Court on or before 10/16/2017. Failure to meet and confer in this regard will result in a waiver of plaintiffs objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/10/2017. (acc)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying without prejudice 29 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 36 Plaintiff's Rule 56(d) Request. The Court, in its discretion, GRANTS Mendez's Rule 56(d) request and DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Optio's mot ion for summary judgment. The parties are DIRECTED to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Crawford to conduct expedited discovery in preparation for the issues in Optio's motion for summary judgment. The magistrate judge will issue a schedu ling order concerning expedited discovery and a deadline for a renewed summary judgment motion should Optio choose to bring one. As noted, above, Judge Crawford may set all other dates she feels appropriate at this time. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/3/2017. (acc)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 21 Defendant's Motion to Stay. Accordingly, the motion hearing presently set for 3/30/2017, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/8/2017. (acc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. Optio Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Mendez
Represented By: Kas L. Gallucci
Represented By: Albert R Limberg
Represented By: Ronald Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optio Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Tomio B Narita
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Topor
Represented By: Jennifer Lawdan Yazdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?