InfoGation Corp. v. Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd et al
Plaintiff: InfoGation Corp.
Defendant: Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd and Huawei Device USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01903
Filed: July 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jill L. Burkhardt
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Denying without Prejudice 66 Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/16/2017. (ag)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/5/2017.(fth)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Tentative Claim Construction Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/3/2017.(ag)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Denying 46 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/27/2017. (ag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InfoGation Corp. v. Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InfoGation Corp.
Represented By: Jennifer L Feldman
Represented By: Michael L Kirby
Represented By: John P. Moy
Represented By: Edward A. Pennington
Represented By: John P Pennington
Represented By: Sean T Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Device USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?