Jones v. U.S. Border Patrol Agent Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: Alton Jones
Defendant: Agent Hernandez and Doe Agents #1 through #4
Case Number: 3:2016cv01986
Filed: August 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER: (1) Granting in part and denying in part 98 Defendants' Combined Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Granting Defendant United States' Motion for Summary Judgment on Its Counterclaim; and (3) Granting 101 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on The FOIA Cause of Action. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 11/15/2018. (jao)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying 82 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 7/30/2018. (sjt)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting 105 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 7/23/2018. (rmc)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objections to January 23, 2018 Discovery Order re 85 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 4/27/2018. (jao)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting 74 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/29/2018. (jao)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER on Discovery Dispute (FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice; Fourteen Topics). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/23/2018.(jao)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER on discovery disputes (Plaintiff's RFP (Set 4) Nos. 41-49 and RFI No. 1. (ajf)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or For Summary Judgment. Plaintiff will have leave to amend the SAC in accordance with the terms of this order. Any amendment must be filed by Friday, December 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 11/9/2017. (jao)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 54 Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 8/24/2017. (lrf)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER on Discovery Disputes Over Annotated Map and Social Media Postings. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/16/2017.(jao)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. U.S. Border Patrol Agent Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton Jones
Represented By: Mitra Ebadolahi
Represented By: John David Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agent Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Agents #1 through #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?