Nunez v. BAE Systems San Diego Ship Repair Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Eduardo Nunez |
Defendant: |
BAE Systems San Diego Ship Repair Inc. and DOES 1 through 50 |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv02162 |
Filed: |
August 26, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Janis L. Sammartino |
Presiding Judge: |
Nita L. Stormes |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Labor Litigation |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 14, 2017 |
Filing
62
ORDER (1) Granting Final Settlement Motion; (2) Granting Motion for Attorney's Fees; and (3) Granting Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/14/2017. Pursuant to the Parties Agreement, the action is dismissed with prejudice. (mpl)
|
August 10, 2017 |
Filing
59
ORDER (1) Accepting Proposed Supplemental Notice; (2) Directing Supplemental Notice to the Class; (3) Setting a New Date for the Final Fairness Hearing, re: 58 Notice of Joint Statement Regarding Supplemental Notice To The Settlement Class, filed by Eduardo Nunez. It is Ordered that the Court Grants the Parties' requests in their Joint Statement (ECF No. 58). Accordingly, the Court Directs the Parties to provide this supplemental notice to the Class Members consistent with the Court's Order. The Court also sets the Final Fairness Hearing date on 11/7/2017 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/10/2017.(mpl)
|
August 2, 2017 |
Filing
57
ORDER Directing Supplemental Notice to the Class re (ECF Nos. 37 , 46 , 47 ). It is ordered that on or before seven days from the date on which this Order is electronically docketed the Parties shall submit: (1) a statement confirming or den ying their willingness to bear the costs of re- notifying the Class, and, if the Parties wish to do so; (2) a proposed supplemental notice incorporating the Court's ruling; and (3) a proposed schedule and procedures for this supplemental no tice, which include a new date for the Final Fairness Hearing. Once the Court receives these documents, the Court will promptly assess the adequacy of the supplemental notice pursuant to Rule 23(c)(2)(B) and issue a schedule for notification and a new date for the Final Fairness Hearing. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/2/2017.(dxj)
|
February 13, 2017 |
Filing
18
ORDER: (1) Conditionally Certifying Settlement Class Action; (2) Preliminarily Approving Proposed Settlement; (3) Approving Notice To Class; And (4) Setting Final Approval Hearing Date (ECF No. 15 ). The Court grants the parties' Joint Motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement. It is ordered that a Final Approving Hearing is set for 7/27/2017 at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom 4A.Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/13/2017. (dxj)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?