Aguon v. Montgomery et al
Petitioner: |
Michael J. Aguon |
Respondent: |
Warren L. Montgomery and Kamala D. Harris |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv02421 |
Filed: |
September 26, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
Imperial |
Presiding Judge: |
Jan M. Adler |
Presiding Judge: |
Dana M. Sabraw |
Nature of Suit: |
General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 20, 2018 |
Filing
36
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Petitioner's arguments are without merit. The Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied. Court declines to issue the certificate of appealability. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/20/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
|
August 30, 2017 |
Filing
16
ORDER: (1) Adopting 13 Report and Recommendation; (2) Granting 12 Motion to Stay; and (2) Denying Respondent's 10 Motion to Dismiss. This action is stayed until the California Supreme Court rules on Petitioner's pending state habeas petition Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/28/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
|
June 12, 2017 |
Filing
13
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on the Warden's 10 Motion to Dismiss Habeas Petition and Petitioner Aguon's Request for a Stay. This Court RECOMMENDS that: 1) Aguon's request for a stay (ECF No. 12) be GRANTED, and that the case be stayed until the California Supreme Court rules on his pending state habeas petition; 2) Aguon be required to file a status report about his state habeas petition every two months, starting on the first day of the month after the District Judge's rulin g in this matter, and to file a final status report within seven days of any ruling on his state habeas petition; and 3) respondent's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 10) be DENIED. Upon being served with a copy of this report, the parties have 14 day s to file any objections. Upon being served with any objections, the party receiving such objections has 14 days to file any response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 6/12/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?