Kerns v. Wenner
Plaintiff: Larry D. Kerns
Defendant: Mathew J. Wenner
Case Number: 3:2016cv02438
Filed: September 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER: The motion for summary judgment is Granted. (ECF No. 152 ). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment on behalf of Defendant Wenner and against Plaintiff as to all claims. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 07/23/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER: The motion for reconsideration, the motion demanding redaction, and the motion demanding that the pretrial conference schedule be resumed are Denied. (ECF Nos. 196 , 198 , 200 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 06/22/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER: The motion to reconsider partial summary judgment (ECF No. 149 ), the motion to dismiss (ECF No. 154 ), the motion for exclusion of GCIU Employer Retirement Fund's contract with ERISA (ECF No. 156 ), the motion to allow Plaintiff to co rrect exhibits in motion to reconsider partial summary judgment (ECF No. 158 ), and the motion to remove document 165 from the docket (ECF No. 170 ) filed by Plaintiff Larry D. Kerns are Denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 05/07/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's (1) Motion to Deny Deposition Rights (Doc. No. 134 ), (2) Request for Court Order (Doc. No. 138 ), and (3) Request for Order (Doc. No. 142 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 01/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER: The motions filed by Plaintiff are Denied. (ECF Nos. 73 , 80 , 83 , 87 , 89 , 108 , 122 , 124 , 126 , 130 , 132 , 136 , 140 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/20/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: The motion for exclusion of Employee Retirement Income Security Act rules and regulations filed by Plaintiff is denied (Dkt # 44 ). The motion to include Lincoln Financial Group as a defendant and increase the monetary relief requested to � 36;15,000,000 filed by Plaintiff is denied (Dkt # 59 ). The motion to include civil mail fraud filed by Plaintiff is denied (Dkt # 66 ). The motion to strike Plaintiff's motion to include civil mail fraud filed by Defendant Mathew J. Wenner is denied (Dkt # 67 ). The motion for the entry of default against Lincoln Financial Group filed by Plaintiff is denied. (Dkt # 69 ). The request for the Court to issue an order filed by Plaintiff is denied. (Dkt # 71 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/7/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerns v. Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D. Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew J. Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?