McClure v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Christopher Joseph McClure
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv02515
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jill L. Burkhardt
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:0402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Adopting 25 Report and Recommendation; Denying Defendant's 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/24/2018. (mpl)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 19 , 21 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block on 4/17/2018.(mpl)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing United States Marshal Service re 5 Amended Complaint filed by Christopher Joseph McClure. It is ordered that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint survives the sua sponte screening required by 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/20/2017. (USM notified via NEF)(dxj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClure v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Joseph McClure
Represented By: Monica Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?