Koistra et al v. San Diego, County of et al
Plaintiff: Trina Koistra, Georgia Koistra and Larry Ford
Defendant: San Diego, County of and DOES 1 through 50
Case Number: 3:2016cv02539
Filed: October 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Andrew G. Schopler
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. The hearing set for April 20, 2018 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/19/18. (dlg)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying Defendants' 53 Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Opinion as Moot. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/11/18. (dlg)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in Part Defendants' 44 Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Defendants' motion to dismiss as to Ford's claims against Defendant Deputy Vail and Ford's Monell claim against the County. The Court denies Defendants' motion to dismiss Koistra's Monell claim against the County. The hearing set for December 15, 2017 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/12/17. (dlg)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 34 Motion to Dismiss With Leave to Amend. Plaintiffs shall file a second amended complaint within seven days of the filed date of this order. The hearing set for October 20, 2017 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/19/17. (dlg)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte 18 Application to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint within 3 days of the filing of this order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/14/17. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koistra et al v. San Diego, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina Koistra
Represented By: Gregory Paul Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Koistra
Represented By: Gregory Paul Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Ford
Represented By: Gregory Paul Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego, County of
Represented By: Juan Fernando Kish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?