San Diego Branch of National Association For The Advancement of Colored People et al
Plaintiff: San Diego Branch of National Association For The Advancement of Colored People, Eric Bidwell, Carl Box, Eric Burney, Levandis Carter, Tegan Daniels, Michael Feinstein, Andrew Jimenez, Andrew A. Paster, Jeff Provenzano, Ian Whitehouse and Jamie Wilson
Defendant: San Diego, County of, William D. Gore, El Cajon, City of, Jeff Davis and Does 1-25, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2016cv02575
Filed: October 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER Denying the Bidwell Plaintiffs' 196 Motion to Strike Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority; and Granting Bidwell Plaintiffs Leave to File a Response. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 10/16/20. (dlg)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 107 Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion to add "Doe" Defendants. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/12/2019. (jpp)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 73 and 74 Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiffs MAY FILE a final amended complaint on or before thirty (30) days of the date on which this Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/25/2019. (ag)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 44 45 Motions to Dismiss. The Court grants in part Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Dismisses: (1) Plaintiffs' Third and Fourth Causes of Action as to Sheriff William Gore and the County of San Diego; (2) Plaintiffs' Sixth Cause of Action; (3) Plaintiffs' Eighth Cause of Action. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are otherwise denied. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/19/2018. (mpl)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Denying 48 Plaintiffs' Motion to Relieve Plaintiffs From Claim Filing Requirements. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/8/2017. (mpl)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 22 Motion to Dismiss and 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. It is ordered that the Court dismisses: (1) Sheriff Gore and the County of San Diego from this action; (2) Plaintiff NAAAC P from this action; (3) Plaintiffs' First Cause of Action; (4) Plaintiffs' Second Cause of Action except for those claims relating to the 10/1/2016 vigil; (5) Plaintiffs' Fourth Cause of Action regarding the three children; and (6) Plaintiffs' Sixth Cause of Action. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are otherwise denied. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file any such amendment on or before fourteen days of the date on which this Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/6/2017. (dxj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Diego Branch of National Association For The Advancement of Colored People et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego Branch of National Association For The Advancement of Colored People
Represented By: Todd T Cardiff
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bidwell
Represented By: Todd T Cardiff
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Box
Represented By: Todd T Cardiff
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Burney
Represented By: Todd T Cardiff
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levandis Carter
Represented By: Todd T Cardiff
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tegan Daniels
Represented By: Todd T Cardiff
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Feinstein
Represented By: Todd T Cardiff
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Jimenez
Represented By: Todd T Cardiff
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew A. Paster
Represented By: Todd T Cardiff
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Provenzano
Represented By: Todd T Cardiff
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Whitehouse
Represented By: Todd T Cardiff
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Wilson
Represented By: Todd T Cardiff
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego, County of
Represented By: John P. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Cajon, City of
Represented By: Carrie L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Davis
Represented By: Carrie L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?