Maxin v. RHG & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Heather Maxin
Defendant: RHG & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02625
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: the Court: 1. GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; 2. GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs; 3. As such, the Court APPROVES $247,500 in attorney fees and costs to Class Counsel; 4. APPROVES a $5,000 award to Ms. Heather Maxin; 5. APPROVES a $76,270.14 payment to KCC as settlement administrator; 6. DISMISSES this action WITH PREJUDICE with the terms of the Settlement. (mpl)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 Proposed Supplemental Notice. The Court orders Class Counsel to file its fee motion forthwith. Subsequently, the parties shall file another proposed supplemental notice, taking into consideration the Court's requirements listed within this order. The parties shall also propose dates for: (1) the notification of the class members of the supplemental notice; (2) the deadline for class members to object; (3) the deadline for Class Counsel to file a Motion for Final Approva l; and (4) a hearing date for said Motion. Finally, the Court vacates the Final Approval Motion hearing currently set for 9/28/2017 at 1:30 p.m. The hearing will be continued to a later date. Once the Court receives the parties' updated proposed supplemental notice, the Court will assess its adequacy and issue a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/20/2017.(mpl)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Supplemental Notice to the Class re 12 Ex Parte MOTION To Modify the Preliminary Approval Order. The Court denies the parties joint motion. The Court orders the parties to submit to the Court for its review the supplemental notice on or before 7 days after the electronic docketing of this order. Once the Court receives the notice, the Court will promptly assess its adequacy pursuant to Rule 23(c)(2)(B) and issue a schedule for notification and further proceedings. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/11/2017. (mpl)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 6 Motion Prelimanary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Final Approval Hearing set for 9/28/2017 at 01:30 p.m. in Courtroom 4D before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/27/2017. (dxj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxin v. RHG & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Maxin
Represented By: Andrei Armas
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Matthew M. Loker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHG & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Lee S Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?