Griffin v. Zurbano et al
Plaintiff: |
Charles E. Griffin, II |
Defendant: |
Racquel E. Zurbano, Dorrie P. Steadman, Michael J. Roggelin, K. Spence and Michael Santos |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv02715 |
Filed: |
October 28, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Joaquin |
Presiding Judge: |
William V. Gallo |
Presiding Judge: |
Janis L. Sammartino |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 4, 2019 |
Filing
133
ORDER (1) Adopting 129 Report and Recommendation, and (2) Granting 87 and 88 Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/04/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
|
February 13, 2019 |
Filing
129
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 87 and 88 Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment. Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/13/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
|
October 11, 2018 |
Filing
111
ORDER Following in Camera Review of Personnel Records and Denying AS Moot Motion for Protective Order [ 106 , 108 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/11/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
|
September 20, 2018 |
Filing
97
ORDER on Plaintiff's motion to compel, for extension of time, and to stay proceedings. (Doc. Nos. 71 , 79 , 83 & 94 . Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/20/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
|
May 24, 2018 |
Filing
69
ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 65 Motion for Legal Property. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/24/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
|
August 18, 2017 |
Filing
27
ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's 25 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/17/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
|
February 27, 2017 |
Filing
10
ORDER (1) Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and (2) Granting 4 Motion for And Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Summons and Complaint Pursuant to 28 USC 1915(d) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). It is ordered that US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by garnishing monthly payments from his account in the amount equal to 20% of the preceding month's income and forwarding those payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 pursuant to 28 USC 1915(b)(2). (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/27/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (dxj)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?