Warren v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Plaintiff: Mark Warren
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right, Title/Estate, Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff's Title or any Cloud on Plaintiff's and Does 1 through 99
Case Number: 3:2016cv02872
Filed: November 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting Motion for Attorney's Fees [Doc. No. 80 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/7/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: Wells Fargo's motion to dismiss is Granted in its entirety, and the second amended complaint is Dismissed With Prejudice. It Is So Ordered. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Denying Motion to Stay Foreclosure [Doc. No. 63 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/08/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER on Motions to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [Doc. No. 24 . 43 -1]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/27/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER on Request for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. No. 10 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/11/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER on Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order & Request for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. No. 10 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 5/2/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Warren
Represented By: Mark A Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: David Michael Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David Michael Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right, Title/Estate, Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff's Title or any Cloud on Plaintiff's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?