Dawson v. California Dept of Park & Recreation Officer Nathan Mills

Plaintiff: Helon Dawson
Defendant: California Dept of Park & Recreation Officer Nathan Mills
Case Number: 3:2016cv02925
Filed: December 1, 2016
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Andrew G. Schopler
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. After conducting a de novo review of the R & R's reasoning, Court concludes that Judge Schopler's reasoning is sound. Court overrules Plaintiff's 30 Objection to Report and Recommendation, approves and adopts 29 Report and Recommendation in its entirety, and dismisses without prejudice Plaintiff's action. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/12/2018. (jah)
January 8, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss Case for Failure to Prosecute re 8 Amended Complaint, filed by Helon Dawson Objections to R&R due by 1/22/2018 Replies due by 1/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 1/8/2018.(anh)
March 29, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER terminating as moot Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff filed 8 First Amended Complaint on 3/7/2017. Plaintiff's amended complaint supersedes the original, and her initial Complaint is now treated as "non-existent". Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/29/2017. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson v. California Dept of Park & Recreation Officer Nathan Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helon Dawson
Represented By: Keith Howard Rutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Dept of Park & Recreation Officer Nathan Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?