Chilcote v. Unknown
Petitioner: Ryan Chilcote
Respondent: Unknown
Case Number: 3:2017cv00061
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. The Court adopts in part the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, denies Petitioner's Petition, and denies a certificate of appealability.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Denying 4 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ryan Chilcote. Any party may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties on or before January 11, 2018. Any reply to the Objections shall be served and filed on or before January 23, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 12/20/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Sua Sponte Substituting Respondent; and Denying Motion to Add Respondent 11 as Moot. The Clerk of the Court will modify the docket to reflect "Scott Kernan, Secretary" as respondent in place of "D. Davey.". Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 7/11/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Reopening Case and Setting Briefing Schedule - Motion to Dismiss due 7/10/17 Opposition to Motion due 8/10/17 OR Answer by Respondent due 7/10/2017 Traverse by Petitioner due 8/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 5/22/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice and With Leave to Amend; and Notifying Petitioner of Options to Cure Failure to Exhaust State Court Remedies. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this case he must, no later than March 20, 2017: (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit adequate proof of his inability to pay the fee; (2) file a First Amended Petition that names a proper respondent. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/12/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chilcote v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ryan Chilcote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?