Abuka v. El Cajon Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Richard Olango Abuka
Defendant: Richard Gonsalves, Does 1-10 and City of El Cajon
Case Number: 3:2017cv00089
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting Defendants' 54 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court grants Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in its entirety. The Clerk is instructed to close the file for both 17cv0089-BAS(NLS) and 17cv0347-BAS(NLS). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/7/2019. (jah)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 48 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion. The Court grants Plaintiffs' motion and dismisses without prejudice Plaintiffs' Fourth Cause of Action for wrongful death based on negligence in Case No. 17-cv-347-BAS-NLS under Rule 41(a)(2) so that Plaintiffs may pursue their state law claim in state court. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/18/2018. (rmc)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying Defendants' 16 Amended Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 17 Motion to Dismiss. Court denies Officer Gonsalves' Motion to Dismiss, but grants the City of El Cajon's Motion to Dismiss. Court gives Plaintiff leave to amend the First Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint must be filed by 9/8/2017. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/25/2017. (jah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abuka v. El Cajon Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Olango Abuka
Represented By: Rodney S. Diggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gonsalves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of El Cajon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?