Dehen v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Dehen
Defendant: John Doe, Twitter, Inc. and University of San Diego
Case Number: 3:2017cv00198
Filed: February 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331as Fed. Question: Assault, Libel, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER on Dehen's Memorandum for Cause. The Court finds that Twitter, USD, and Perkins Coie are "prevailing parties," and that Dehen has failed to show cause why Defendants' costs should not be taxed against her. Pursuant to the Co urt's Order of Dismissal, Dkt. 83 , the clerk is therefore ordered to enter judgment in favor of Twitter, USD, and Perkins Coie. This does not affect Dehen's remaining claims against John Doe. Defendants may each submit a bill of costs by 11/9/2018. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/24/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss With Prejudice (Dkt. 57 , 58 , 63 ); Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Dkt. 67 , 79 , 82 ). Dehen shall have until 11/16/2018 to determine the identity of Doe(s) and to substitute those parties in. If she meets that deadline, she shall have until 12/17/2018 to properly serve them. Dehen is ordered to show cause by 10/19/2018 why each of the Defendants' costs should not be taxed against her. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/18/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing. The Court asks Dehen, Twitter, and USD to each file a three-page memorandum by 8/20/2018. The Court will then decide the pending motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/30/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting Leave to Amend. Defendants' motions to dismiss (Dkt. 29 , 30 ) are denied as moot. Dehen's motion to file a Second Amended Complaint 45 is granted. She must file a new complaint by 4/6/2018. Defendants may refile motions to dismiss by 4/27/2018. Dehen must file an opposition by 5/11/2018, and Defendants may file replies by 5/18/2018. The Court will decide the motions on the papers. Dehen's motion to supplement the record 53 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/19/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Documents. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/31/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice and may be re-opened if Plaintiff pays the required filing fee within 45 days of the signature date of this Order. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/24/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dehen v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Dehen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?