Dehen v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: |
Tiffany Dehen |
Defendant: |
John Doe, Twitter, Inc. and University of San Diego |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00198 |
Filed: |
February 1, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Roger T. Benitez |
Presiding Judge: |
William V. Gallo |
Nature of Suit: |
Assault Libel & Slander |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 as Fed. Question: Assault, Libel, Slander |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 24, 2018 |
Filing
85
ORDER on Dehen's Memorandum for Cause. The Court finds that Twitter, USD, and Perkins Coie are "prevailing parties," and that Dehen has failed to show cause why Defendants' costs should not be taxed against her. Pursuant to the Co urt's Order of Dismissal, Dkt. 83 , the clerk is therefore ordered to enter judgment in favor of Twitter, USD, and Perkins Coie. This does not affect Dehen's remaining claims against John Doe. Defendants may each submit a bill of costs by 11/9/2018. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/24/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
|
September 19, 2018 |
Filing
83
ORDER Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss With Prejudice (Dkt. 57 , 58 , 63 ); Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Dkt. 67 , 79 , 82 ). Dehen shall have until 11/16/2018 to determine the identity of Doe(s) and to substitute those parties in. If she meets that deadline, she shall have until 12/17/2018 to properly serve them. Dehen is ordered to show cause by 10/19/2018 why each of the Defendants' costs should not be taxed against her. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/18/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
|
July 30, 2018 |
Filing
73
ORDER for Supplemental Briefing. The Court asks Dehen, Twitter, and USD to each file a three-page memorandum by 8/20/2018. The Court will then decide the pending motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/30/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
|
March 20, 2018 |
Filing
54
ORDER Granting Leave to Amend. Defendants' motions to dismiss (Dkt. 29 , 30 ) are denied as moot. Dehen's motion to file a Second Amended Complaint 45 is granted. She must file a new complaint by 4/6/2018. Defendants may refile motions to dismiss by 4/27/2018. Dehen must file an opposition by 5/11/2018, and Defendants may file replies by 5/18/2018. The Court will decide the motions on the papers. Dehen's motion to supplement the record 53 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/19/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
|
August 1, 2017 |
Filing
25
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Documents. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/31/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing
14
ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice and may be re-opened if Plaintiff pays the required filing fee within 45 days of the signature date of this Order. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/24/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?