Aya Healthcare Services, Inc. et al v. AMN Healthcare, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Aya Healthcare Services, Inc. and Aya Healthcare, Inc. |
Defendant: |
AMN Healthcare, Inc., AMN Healthcare Service, Inc., AMN Services, LLC., MEDEFIS, Inc. and Shiftwise, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00205 |
Filed: |
February 2, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael M. Anello |
Presiding Judge: |
Mitchell D. Dembin |
Nature of Suit: |
Antitrust |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 0001 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 22, 2020 |
Filing
223
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered for Defendants. The Court grants AMN's motion for summary judgment on Aya's claim for exclusionary damages. Having dismissed Aya's federal claims, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Aya's state law claims. (tcf)
|
May 13, 2020 |
Filing
204
ORDER RE: Redacted Version of May 12, 2020 Order. The Court ORDERS the parties to submit a joint proposed redacted version of the Order directly to the undersigned's Chambers e-file address no later than May 20, 2020. The Court will review the proposed submission and issue a redacted version of the May 12, 2020 Order shortly thereafter. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/13/2020. (tcf)
|
May 7, 2020 |
Filing
184
ORDER Granting Defendants' Renewed Motion to File Documents Under Seal [Doc. No. 166 ]. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/7/2020. (anh)
|
April 20, 2020 |
Filing
141
ORDER: (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Motion to File Documents under Seal [Doc. No. 96 ]; Granting in Part and Denying In Part Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal [Doc. No. 123 ]; Granting in Part and Denying In Part Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal [Doc. No. 128 ; and Grant in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to File Documents Under Seal [Doc. No. 131 ]. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/20/2020. (anh)
|
June 19, 2018 |
Filing
34
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 30 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' SAC. The Court dismisses Pla intiffs' tortious interference with prospective economic relations claim without prejudice. Plaintiffs may file a third amended complaint that cures the deficiencies addressed herein with respect to the tortious interference with prospective economic relations claim on or before 6/29/2018. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/19/2018. (rmc)
|
December 6, 2017 |
Filing
22
ORDER Granting in Part 15 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants in part Defendants' motion and dismisses Plaintiffs' claims under the Sherman Act without prejudice. The Court defers ruling on Plaintiffs' state law claims. Plaintiffs may file a Second Amended Complaint that cures the pleading deficiencies identified in this Order on or before 1/5/2018. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/6/2017. (rmc)
|
July 13, 2017 |
Filing
19
NOTICE AND ORDER Providing Tentative Ruling RE: 15 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Court tentatively grants Plaintiffs' request for judicial notice. The Court tentatively grants Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' FACwith leave to amend. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/13/2017.(lrf)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?