Turner Jr. v. County of San Diego
Plaintiff: David B. Turner Jr.
Defendant: County of San Diego
Case Number: 3:2017cv00285
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331pr Fed. Question: Federal Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The record reflects that the Amended Complaint (ECF No. 13 ) was not filed within 21 days after service of the original Complaint (ECF No. 1 ), a responsive pleading, or a motion under Rule 12(b),(e), or (f). The record also reflects that t he Court has not granted Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint. The Amended Complaint is hereby Stricken from the record. If Plaintiff wishes to file an amended complaint in the future, he must first file a Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 01/22/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2018: # 1 Rejected Document) (ajs).
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Dkt # 9 ) is adopted in its entirety. The County's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt # 4 ) is granted. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/12/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 4 MOTION to Dismiss. Objections to R&R due by 7/24/2017. Replies due by 7/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/07/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner Jr. v. County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B. Turner Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?