Ford v. Sinklier et al
Plaintiff: Darren Vincent Ford
Defendant: G. Sinklier and Emmoto
Case Number: 3:2017cv00307
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Presiding Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 33 Defendants' Motion to Compel, Denying Motion for Sanctions, and Granting 41 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Plaintiff is ordered to attend and participate in a properly noticed deposition held before the extended deadli ne of 6/15/2018. However, because Plaintiff is an indigent prisoner, the Court hereby denies Defendants' motion for monetary sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 3/29/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying as moot 17 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 9/26/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt).
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b) (2). Clerk directed to issue a summons as to Plaintiff's Complaint for Defendants Sinklier and Emmoto. US Marshal shall effect service of Complaint and summons. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/19/2017. (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR) (IFP Package prepared and forwarded to Plaintiff) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Sinklier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Vincent Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Sinklier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?