Maksoud v. Hopkins et al
Plaintiff: Charbel Maksoud
Defendant: Bruce Hopkins, Schrell Hopkins, Philippe Guelton, Tirrell Payton, Susan Payton, Shawn Smith, Paul Woodhull, Christian Salaman, Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP, BT Software and Research, Inc., Momentum Marketing, Solutions IQ, Inc., Adlarge, Does 1-100 and SheKnows Media
Case Number: 3:2017cv00362
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation. Court adopts the magistrate judge's 184 Report and Recommendation. Court enforces the settlement agreement entered on record before the magistrate judge on 4/2/2019. Court orders Defendant Guelton to comply with the terms of the settlement agreement and pay Plaintiff Maksoud $17,500 within 30 days. Court orders the parties to file a status report in 30 days. Court reserves the right to take appropriate action if the parties to comply with Court's orders. Court denies as moot Guelton's 157 Motion to Preclude, 158 Motion to Preclude, 159 Motion to Preclude, 160 Motion to Preclude and 161 Motion to Preclude. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/13/2019. (jah)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: Summarily Enforcing Settlement Agreement and Entering Judgment. Objections to R&R due by August 1, 2019. Replies due by August 8, 2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajf)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting 142 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court grants its sua sponte motion for summary judgment. Court grants summary judgment in favor of Defendant Susan Guillory on all of Plaintiff's claims. Court grants summary judgment in favor of Defendant Tirrell Payton on Plaintiff's claims for 1) intentional interference with prospective economic relations, 2) negligent interference with prospective economics relations, 3) common count (money had and received), and 4) declaratory j udgment. The only claims remaining are against Defendants Philippe Guelton and Tirrell Payton for : 1) intentional misrepresentation, 2) aiding and abetting fraud, 3) false promise, 4) unjust enrichment, 5) restitution, 6) constructive trust, 7) breach of fiduciary duties, 8) negligence, 9) unfair business practices, and 10) accounting. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/1/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 99 Defendant Philippe Guelton's Motion for Summary Judgment. the Court denies in part and grants in part Defendant Guelton's motion for summary judgment. Specifically, the Court denies Defendant Guelton's motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiff's claims for: intentional misrepresentation, aiding and abetting fraud, false promise, unjust enrichment, restitution, constructive trust, breach of fiduciary duties, negligence, unfair business practices, and accounting. The Court grants Defendant Guelton's motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiff's claims for: common count (money had and received), intentional interference with prospective economic relations, negligent interference with prospective economic relations, and declaratory judgment. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/13/2018. (acc)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting 102 Defendant Tirrell Payton's Ex Parte Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/24/2018. (sjm)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Rescheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference. Mandatory Settlement Conference reset for 11/14/2018 at 02:00 p.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 08/01/2018.(ajs)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting Defendant SheKnows Media's 76 Motion for Good Faith Settlement Determination. Any and all parties are barred from bringing any future claims against Sheknows for equitable comparative contribution, or partial or comparative indemnity, based on comparative negligence or comparative fault in connection with the conduct in this litigation. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/25/2018. (jah)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Denying Defendant Susan Payton's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Serve [Doc. No. 62 ]. Ms. Payton must file a response to the second amended complaint or before April 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/5/2018. (jjg)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Second Amended Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference [Doc. No. 48 ]. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 12/29/2017. Case Management Conference and Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/22/2018 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Status Conference set for 1/9/2018 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/12/2017. (jjg)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: (1) granting Defendant Solutions IQ, Inc.'s 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; (2) granting Defendant Pillsbury Winthrop Saw Pittmann, LLP and Christian Salaman's 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Clai m; (3) granting in part and denying in part Defendant Tirrell Payton's 22 Motion to Dismiss. If Plaintiff seeks to amend his complaint to cure the deficiencies noted, Plaintiff must file a new complaint as to all defendants and all claims within 30 days of this order. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 6/9/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maksoud v. Hopkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charbel Maksoud
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schrell Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philippe Guelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tirrell Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Woodhull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Salaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BT Software and Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momentum Marketing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutions IQ, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adlarge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SheKnows Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?