In Re TAC Financial, Inc.
Appellant: Direct Benefits, LLC and Andrew C. Gellene
Appellee: Christopher R. Barclay and Remar Investments, LP
Case Number: 3:2017cv00381
Filed: February 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting 56 Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Moot. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/25/2018. (acc)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 70 Andrew L. Jiranek's Unnoposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Appellants Andrew C. Gellene and Direct Benefits, LLC. Attorney Andrew Lynwood Jiranek terminated. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/6/2018. (anh)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 59 The Law Office of William P. Fennel, APLC's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/27/2018. (anh)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 29 Remar Investments, LP's Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal; granting in part and denying in part 29 Remar's Request for Judicial Notice; denying 38 Appellants' Cross Motion to Supplement the Record; and denying as moot 38 and 42 Christopher Barclay's Motions to Strike. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/22/2017. (acc)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 44 Appellant's Ex Parte Motion to Stay Order Pending Appeal; denying as moot 47 Appellant's Amended Ex Parte Motion to Stay with Application to Shorten Time. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/22/2017. (acc)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 16 Appellants' Motion to Stay Disbursement of Policy Proceeds. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/30/2017. (acc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re TAC Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Direct Benefits, LLC
Represented By: William P. Fennell
Represented By: Andrew L. Jiranek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Andrew C. Gellene
Represented By: William P. Fennell
Represented By: Andrew L. Jiranek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Christopher R. Barclay
Represented By: Alan Vanderhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Remar Investments, LP
Represented By: P. Randolph Finch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?