Pavlovich v. Account Discovery Systems, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Juan Pavlovich
Defendant: Account Discovery Systems, LLC and DNF Associates, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00412
Filed: February 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 60 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying all other motions as moot 44 , 48 , 67 , 77 , 79 . The Court finds there was no underlying violation and GRANTS ADS's summary judgment motion. (Doc. No. 60.)Because there is no underlying violation, the Court DENIES as moot DNF's dismissal motion, (Doc. No. 48), both class certification motions, (Doc. Nos. 67, 77), Pavlovich's partial motion for summary judgment, (Doc. No. 44), and ADS's motion to strike plaintiff's declaration, attached to his class certification reply brief, (Doc. No. 79). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/3/2018. (acc)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER (1) Denying Motion to Compel and (2) Denying Request for Sanctions [Doc. No. 65 ). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/10/2018. (dsn)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 53 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Documents and denying Plaintiff's Request for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 11/27/2017. (acc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pavlovich v. Account Discovery Systems, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Pavlovich
Represented By: Jared M. Hartman
Represented By: Asil A Mashiri
Represented By: Babak Semnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account Discovery Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNF Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?