Left Coast Wrestling, LLC. v. Dearborn International, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: |
Left Coast Wrestling, LLC. |
Defendant: |
Dearborn International, LLC. and Duke Minh Le |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00466 |
Filed: |
March 7, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry Alan Burns |
Presiding Judge: |
Nita L. Stormes |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1125 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 1, 2019 |
Filing
110
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Motion for Contempt (ECF Nos. 68 , 87 ). Objections to R&R due by 8/15/2019. Replies due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/1/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
|
March 4, 2019 |
Filing
87
ORDER Denying 61 Motion for Relief From Default Judgment; and Order of Reference. With this order, Left Coast Wrestling's motion for contempt (Docket no. 68 ) is referred to Magistrate Judge Nita Stormes for a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/4/2019. (jdt)
|
August 13, 2018 |
Filing
62
ORDER Requiring Former Counsel for Defendants Duke Minh Le and Dearborn International LLC to File Response; and Order Requiring Le's Counsel to File Response Regarding Status of Dearborn International, LLC., re 61 MOTION to Set Aside Defaul t filed by Duke Minh Le. By 8/27/2018, Le is ordered to file a supplemental memorandum explaining to what extent the injunction would no longer be effective if the judgment against him were vacated but the judgment against Dearborn were not. Within 14 calendar days of the date this order is issued, Samouris is ordered to file a response addressing Le's accusations against Samouris, his co-counsel, and his firm. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/13/2018.(jdt)
|
July 30, 2018 |
Filing
56
ORDER Requiring Substitution of Counsel. Le's new counsel must promptly file an ex parte motion to substitute in as counsel in place of Le, and the motion must be signed by them as well as by Le. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/24/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
|
July 24, 2018 |
Filing
53
ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 50 Motion to Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/23/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
|
July 13, 2018 |
Filing
48
Order or Entry of Judgment; Monetary Award and Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/12/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
|
June 19, 2018 |
Filing
46
ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation, and Granting Default Judgment Against Defendants Duke Minh Le and Dearborn International, LLC; and Order Requiring Plaintiff to Submit Proposed Order. The Court has reviewed the R&R (Dkt. 41 ) and Supplement al R&R (Dkt. 44 ), finds them to be correct, and adopts them. The motion for default judgment (Dkt. 37 ) against Duke Minh Leand Dearborn International, LLC is granted. An order granting the requested relief will follow. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/19/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
|
June 12, 2018 |
Filing
44
Supplemental Recommendation for Order Granting Additional Fees and Costs, re 37 MOTION for Default Judgment against Duke Minh Le and Dearborn International, LLC MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Left Coast Wrestling, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/12/2018. (jdt) Modified on 6/13/2018 to add all non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. (jdt).
|
May 23, 2018 |
Filing
41
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 37 MOTION for Default Judgment against Duke Minh Le and Dearborn International, LLC MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Left Coast Wrestling, LLC. Objections to R&R due by 6/8/2018. Replies due by 6/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/23/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?