Dickey v. Strayhorn et al
Plaintiff: Gary Dickey
Defendant: D. Strayhorn and D. Paramo
Case Number: 3:2017cv00546
Filed: March 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jill L. Burkhardt
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: (1) Adopting 35 Report and Recommendation; and (2) Granting Defendant D. Paramo's 22 Motion to Dismiss. The Court (1) adopts Judge Burkhardt's R&R in its entirety, and (2) grants Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as to Warden Paramo, (ECF No. 22 ). The Court dismisses without prejudice Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment cause of action against Defendant Paramo. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/8/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Granting Defendant's 22 Motion to Dismiss. Objections to R&R are due by 2/12/2018. Replies are due by 2/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 1/22/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Plaintiff's Second Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 9/26/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 15 Second Motion to Appoint Counsel. It is ordered that this denial is without prejudice, however, and Plaintiff is therefore not precluded from requesting the appointment of counsel at a later stage in this case, should he be able to make the requisite showing of exceptional circumstances at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 7/21/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying without Prejudice Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Viewing the exceptional circumstances factors together, Plaintiff has not shown a likelihood of success on the merits of his case or that he cannot articulate his claims and litigate this action pro se. Accordingly, plaintiff has not established the exceptional circumstances required for the appointment of counsel pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(1), and Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is denied. This denial is without prejudice, however, and plaintiff is therefore not precluded from requesting the appointment of counsel at a later stage in this case, should he be able to make the requisite showing of exceptional circumstances at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/25/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickey v. Strayhorn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Strayhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Paramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?