Davis v. San Diego District Attorney et al
Plaintiff: Gavin B. Davis
Defendant: San Diego District Attorney, Leonard Trinh, San Diego Police Department and John Does
Case Number: 3:2017cv00654
Filed: March 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting 76 Motion to Dismiss; Dismissing Complaint; Denying 77 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 81 Motion for Declaratory Judgment; Denying 94 Motion Ex parte Motion for Joinder. The Clerk SHALL close the file. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/4/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Denying 42 Request for Rule 45 Subpoena/Request for Relief Via Declaratory Decree. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/5/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: (1) Granting 44 Motion to Dismiss; (2) Denying as Moot 34 Motion for Protective Order; (3) Denying as Moot 59 Motion for Joinder; and (4) Denying as Moot 63 Motion to for Access to Courts. The Court grants Defendants' Motion to Di smiss, (ECF No. 44 ). Accordingly, the Court Dismisses Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, (ECF No. 37 ). Additionally, the Court denies as moot Plaintiff's pending motions, (ECF Nos. 34 , 59 , 63 ). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Denying 40 Request for U.S. Marshal Service. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/4/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 5 6 Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, if any, on or before thirty (30) days of the date on which this order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/12/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(fth)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 14 Motion to File Electronically. In the present motion, Plaintiff has not provided any information about his computer or its software. Without such information, the Court is unable to assess whether his equipment and software meet the technical specifications required. Accordingly, the Court denies without prejudice plaintiff's motion. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/20/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/30/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. San Diego District Attorney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavin B. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego District Attorney
Represented By: Ronald Lenert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Trinh
Represented By: Ronald Lenert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Police Department
Represented By: Hannah Melissa Girer-Rosenkrantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?