Schmitt v. U.S. Marshal Service et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael Schmitt |
Defendant: |
U.S. Marshal Service and Walker, |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00817 |
Filed: |
April 19, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
Kern |
Presiding Judge: |
Karen S. Crawford |
Presiding Judge: |
Janis L. Sammartino |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2672 pi Federal Tort Claim Act - Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 20, 2017 |
Filing
4
ORDER: Denying 3 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis as Barred by 28 USC 1915(g), and (2) Dismissing Civil Action Without Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/20/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
|
August 1, 2017 |
Filing
2
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE Action Without Prejudice for Failing to Either Pay Filing Fee Required Or Move to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is ordered that the Court dismisses this action sua sponte without prejudice for failure to pay the $ 400 civil filing and administrative fee or to submit a Motion to Proceed IFP pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1914(a) and 1915(a); and Grants Plaintiff forty-five (45) days leave from the date this Order is filed to: (a) prepay the entire $ ;400 civil filing and administrative fee; or (b) complete and file a Motion to Proceed IFP which includes a certified copy of his trust account statement for the 6-month period preceding the filing of his Complaint. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)( 2); S.D. Cal. Civ. L.R. 3.2(b). If Plaintiff fails to either prepay the $400 civil filing fee or complete and submit the enclosed Motion to Proceed IFP within 45 days, this action will remain dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff� 39;s failure to satisfy 28 U.S.C. § 1914(a)'s fee requirements and without further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/1/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Motion to Proceed IFP Mailed)(dxj)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?