Garfield Beach CVS LLC v. Palm Care Pharmacy et al
Plaintiff: Garfield Beach CVS LLC
Defendant: Mollison Pharmacy, Samera Yokoub and DOES 1 through 50
Case Number: 3:2017cv00879
Filed: May 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying without prejudice 26 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/22/2017. (acc)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 3 Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/9/2017. (rlu)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 3 Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite Discovery and for a Preservation Order. Plaintiff's motion for a preservation order is granted. Plaintiff's motion for expedited discovery is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 5/24/2017. (dls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garfield Beach CVS LLC v. Palm Care Pharmacy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garfield Beach CVS LLC
Represented By: Dan Forman
Represented By: Karimah J. Lamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mollison Pharmacy
Represented By: Daniel W Towson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samera Yokoub
Represented By: Daniel W Towson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?