Johnson v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Sedric Eugene Johnson
Defendant: John Doe, Lopez and Garcia
Case Number: 3:2017cv00889
Filed: May 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jill L. Burkhardt
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. The Court dismisses Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint in its entirety for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) and § 1915A(b). Because the Court finds further amendment futile, leave to amend is denied.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER (1) Granting 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; (2) Vacating Order 20 and Clerk's Judgment 21 ; and (3) Granting Plaintiff Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. The Court grants Plaintiff thirty (30) days to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/5/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Blank copy of Complaint Under the Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. § 1983 form mailed to Plaintiff.)(jdt)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Court dismisses this action in its entirety without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to state a claim and his failure to prosecute in compliance with the Court's 11/28/2017 Order. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/12/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Dismissing First Amended Complaint Pursuant to 28 USC §1915(e)(2) and §1915A(b)(1). The Court grants Plaintiff thirty (30) days leave from the date of this Order in which to file an Amended Complaint which cures the deficiencies of pleading noted. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint must be complete by itself without reference to his original pleading. Defendants not named and any claim not re-alleged in his Amended Complaint will be considered waived. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/27/2017. (Blank 1983 form mailed to Plaintiff with a copy of this order.) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: 1) Granting 8 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; 2) Denying 10 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; and 3) Dismissing Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) and § 1915A(b)(1). The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is order ed to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward p ayments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). The Complaint is dismissed sua sponte for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. &# 167; 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and § 1915A(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted 45 days from the date of this order to file an Amended Complaint which cures the deficiencies of the pleading. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/11/2017. (Copy of Order mailed to Secretary, CDCR)(Blank copy of 1983 Complaint form mailed to Plaintiff). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lrf)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying 2 Motion To Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Dismissing Action Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/12/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)("Motion and Declaration in Support of Motion to Proceed IFP" Form mailed to Plaintiff)(lrf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedric Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?