Mohamed v. Sea World Parks & Entertainment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Reem Mohamed
Defendant: Sea World, LLC and Does 1-50
Case Number: 3:2017cv00928
Filed: May 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Jill L. Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting Joint Motion and Entering Stipulated Protective Order [ECF No. 24 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 1/18/2018. (jjg)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part The Parties' Joint Motion to Continue Pretrial Dates; and (2) Issuing Amended Scheduling Order [ECF Nos. 14 , 17 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 11/06/2017. (jjg)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Joint Motion and Stipulation Re: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Telephonic Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/29/2017. (jjg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohamed v. Sea World Parks & Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reem Mohamed
Represented By: William E Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea World, LLC
Represented By: Chelsea Yamabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?