La Jolla Spa MD, Inc. et al v. Avidas Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: La Jolla Spa MD, Inc. and Dianne York-Goldman
Defendant: Avidas Pharmaceuticals, LLC and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 3:2017cv01124
Filed: June 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER re 105 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Sanctions Order. The Court finds the objection untimely and declines to rule on the merits of Defense Counsel's objection to the Magistrate Judge's sanctions order. Accordingly, the Magistrate Judge's order remains in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/10/2019.(rmc)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Denying 96 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. The Court finds that Defendant is not entitled to dismissal of Plaintiff's claims or summary judgment in its favor. Accordingly, the Court denies Defendant's motion in its entirety. The Court will issue a pretrial scheduling order forthwith. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/4/2019. (rmc)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting 93 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Without reimbursement from Defendant, Chovanes is sanctioned in the amount of $28,502.03 payable to Ryan's trust account on or before 9/17/2019. Chovanes shall self-report to the S tate Bar of Pennsylvania on or before 9/24/2019. The reporting shall consist of a copy of this Order, the full transcript of the Gardner deposition, the full transcript of the 8/16/2019 sanctions hearing, and the 128 video clips submitted as part of Plaintiff's sanctions motion. On or before 10/1/2019, Chovanes shall file a declaration under oath that confirms compliance with this Order and that all documents and video clips were submitted to the State Bar of Pennsylvania. Chovanes shall he nceforth attach a copy of this Order as an exhibit to any pro hac vice application for admission to practice before the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. This requirement shall have no expiration date and shall remain in effect in perpetuity. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/30/2019. (rmc)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting 77 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiff has met the requirements of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 15(a) and 16(b). Accordingly, the Court grants Plaintiff's motion. The Clerk of Court is instructed to file Plaintiff's proposed Third Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 77-7) as a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/29/2019. (rmc)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Overruling 64 Plaintiff's Objections to 60 Magistrate Judge's February 8, 2019 Order. The Court overrules Plaintiff's objections to Judge Gallo's order sustaining in part Defendant's relevancy objections to RFP Nos. 8 and 11-16. However, for the reasons stated herein, the Court cannot conclusively determine whether the scope of discovery delineated in the 2/8/2019 order is limited to RFP Nos. 8 and 11-16, or whether it is a limitation on all discovery. Therefore, the Court overrules without prejudice Plaintiff's objection to the scope of discovery. Following clarification of the scope of discovery, Plaintiff may re-object. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/4/2019. (rmc)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference re Doc. Nos. 57 & 58 . The parties shall submit a proposed protective order to this Court no later than 2/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/8/2019.(rmc)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER (1) Denying in Part 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order; Denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint. The Court denies in part Plaintiff's ex parte application to modify th e scheduling order. Specifically, the Court denies Plaintiff's request to extend the deadline to amend the pleadings and refers the remainder of Plaintiff's ex parte application to Magistrate Judge Gallo. Additionally, the Court denies Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a TAC. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/12/2018. (rmc)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 4 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. Plaintiffs must file a First Amended Complaint ("FAC"), if any, on or before 11/13/2017. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/27/2017. (ag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La Jolla Spa MD, Inc. et al v. Avidas Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Jolla Spa MD, Inc.
Represented By: Sean D Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne York-Goldman
Represented By: Sean D Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avidas Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Gary K Brucker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?