Mitchell v. State of California
Petitioner: Mike E. Mitchell
Respondent: State of California
Case Number: 3:2017cv01204
Filed: May 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice and With Leave to Amend. To have this case reopened, Petitioner must, no later than 11/24/2017, file a Second Amended Petition that cures the pleading deficiencies described above. Petitioner is advised that if he has not submitted a second amended petition- asserting a cognizable challenge to his custody based on a violation of federal law and alleging exhaustion of his state court remedies with regard to any claims- by 11/24/2017, he will have to st art over by filing a completely new habeas petition in this Court. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 09/20/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)[Copy of this Order and a blank 28 U.S.C. 2254 petition form were sent to Petitioner] (ajs)
August 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action remains dismissed without prejudice to Petitioner to file a First Amended Petition in accordance with the Courts previous Order of dismissal on or before September 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/18/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJDUICE. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/25/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Copy of this Order and a blank petition form and a blank In Forma Pauperis Application were sent to Petitioner)(fth)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mike E. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of California
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?