Fudge v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Carmine B Fudge
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2017cv01423
Filed: July 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: (1) Adopting 19 Report and Recommendation; (2) Granting 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) Denying 15 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. This matter is remanded for further administrative proceedings. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 7/10/2018. (jao) [certified copy mailed to SSA]
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 15 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nancy A. Berryhill, 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carmine B Fudge. Any party having objections to the Courts proposed findings and rec ommendationsshall serve and file specific written objections within 14 days after being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation. A party may respond to the other partys objections within 14 days after being served with a copy of the objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block on 6/25/2018.(jao)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Referring to Magistrate for Report and Recommendation. US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. If the parties seek to file motions, they shall contact the chambers of Judge Adler to secure scheduling, filing, and hearing dates. All motion(s) for summary judgment must be filed and served no later than 120 days after the Government files its answer. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 8/21/2017. (jao)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fudge v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmine B Fudge
Represented By: Lawrence D Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?