Welk Resort Group, Inc. et al v. Reed Hein & Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Welk Resort Group, Inc. and Welk Resorts Platinum Owners Association
Defendant: Reed Hein & Associates, LLC, Schroeter Goldmark & Bender, P.S. and Ken B. Privett, PLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv01499
Filed: July 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Presiding Judge: Andrew G. Schopler
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 84 Defendant Schroeter Goldmark and Bender's Motion for Attorney Fees and costs. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/04/2020. (jpp)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: (1) Granting Defendant Schroeter Goldmark & Bender's Special Motion to Strike; (2) Denying as Moot Defendant Schroeter Goldmark & Bender's Motion to Dismiss; (3) Granting in Part Defendant Ken B. Privett PLC's Motion to Dismiss; and (4) Granting in Part Defendant Reed Hein & Associates, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/18/2019. (lrf)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying as Moot Motions to Dismiss and Strike the First Amended Complaint(Doc. No.s 30 , 31 , 32 , and 33 ). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on October 30, 2017. (dsn)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING Complaint with Leave to Amend for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. If Plaintiffs choose to file an amended complaint, they must do so no later than August 11, 2017. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/26/2017.(sjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welk Resort Group, Inc. et al v. Reed Hein & Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welk Resort Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lee Kibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welk Resorts Platinum Owners Association
Represented By: Michael Lee Kibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hein & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Gregory K Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schroeter Goldmark & Bender, P.S.
Represented By: Gregor A Hensrude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken B. Privett, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?