Grattan v. Sutton et al
Petitioner: Shane Grattan
Respondent: John Sutton and Xavier Becerra
Case Number: 3:2017cv01523
Filed: July 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Adopting 13 Report and Recommendation Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/17/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Shane Grattan. Objections to R&R due by 5/4/2018. Replies due by 5/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 4/20/18.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Denying 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action remains dismissed without prejudice to Petitioner to pay the filing fee or submit adequate proof of his inability to do so on or before October 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/24/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grattan v. Sutton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shane Grattan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Sutton
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?