Limpin et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Melchor Karl T. Limpin, Jayson San Agustin and Froilan Q. Mendoza
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2017cv01729
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346 U.S. Defendant
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 27 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/25/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting Defendant's 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/9/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying 18 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/26/2018. The Court finds that neither the interests of justice nor any exceptional circumstances warrant appointment of counsel at this time and denies Plaintiff's motion. This denial is without prejudice should Plaintiff later be able to make the requisite showing of exceptional circumstances. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiff Limpin's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; (2) Dismissing Plaintiffs Mendoza and Agustin Without Prejudice; (3) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service; (4) Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and (5) Denying Motion for Class Certification. The Court Dismisses without prejudice plaintiffs Mendoza and Agustin as plaintiffs and dismisses as moot plaintiffs Mendoza and Agustin's Motions to Proceed IFP, (ECF Nos. 3, 4). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/26/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (IFP Packet Mailed) (mpl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Limpin et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melchor Karl T. Limpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayson San Agustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Froilan Q. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?