Ogunsalu v. Office of Administrative Hearings et al
Plaintiff: |
Cornelius Oluseyi Ogunsalu |
Defendant: |
Office of Administrative Hearings, California Commission on Teacher Credentialing and California Attorney General's Office |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv01766 |
Filed: |
September 1, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Gonzalo P. Curiel |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew G. Schopler |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 va Fed. Question: Violation 5th & 14th Amendment |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 3, 2019 |
Filing
59
ORDER Granting 39 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint; Denying 31 Motion to Amend or Modify Judgment; Denying 28 as Moot Motion to Compel; and Denying 37 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/3/19. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
December 20, 2018 |
Filing
47
ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant Office of the Attorney General. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/20/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
November 15, 2018 |
Filing
25
ORDER granting Defendants Office of Administrative Hearings, California Commission on Teacher Credentialing, Ani Kindall and Adam Berg's 18 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendants Office of Administrative Hearin g and California Commission on Teacher Credentialing are dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Ani Kindall and Adam Berg are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/15/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
|
August 17, 2018 |
Filing
13
ORDER Granting 12 Motion for Service of Summons and Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/17/18. (Summons, USM 285 forms, certified copies of Amended Complaint & this Order mailed to Plaintiff) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (dlg)
|
July 13, 2018 |
Filing
8
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Reconsideration; Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend; and Denying Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff may, within 30 days of the date this order is issued, file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies noted in the Courts previous order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/13/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
November 8, 2017 |
Filing
3
ORDER Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint Without Prejudice. Within 21 days of the filing of this order, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies explained above. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/7/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?