State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. v. Boermans et al

Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Defendant: Mathias Boermans, Peggy Nickolet, Chubb Insurance Co., Aviva Insurance Co. and Orion Travel Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01864
Filed: September 13, 2017
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED The court grants Chubbs motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, grants Orions motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, and grants Chubbs motion to dismiss the action without prejudice. Case is dismissed without prejudice. (gac)
June 5, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The court grants Chubbs motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, grants Orions motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, and grants Chubbs motion to dismiss the action without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the file. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/4/2018. (gac)
May 8, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Following ENE. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on May 4, 2018. Parties are ordered to contact the Chambers of Judge Major within five (5) days of District Judge Millers ruling on the pending motions [see ECF Nos. 8, 9 and 13] so that the Court may open discovery and set pretrial deadlines if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/8/2018.(gac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. v. Boermans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Represented By: Lance David Orloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathias Boermans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Nickolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviva Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orion Travel Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?