Cowan v. Gastelo

Petitioner: Eric Jeffrey Cowan
Respondent: Josie Gastelo
Case Number: 3:2017cv01994
Filed: June 16, 2017
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Re Denial of 5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eric Jeffrey Cowan. Any party to this action may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties no later than 09/28/2018. Any Reply to the Objections shall be filed with the Court and served on all parties no later than 10/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 08/31/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
April 19, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court (1) Notice of Opportunity to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (28 U.S.C. § 636(c), F.R.C.P. 73); and (2) ORDER Requiring Response to Petition (28 U.S.C. § 2254, Rule 4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 04/19/2018.(Petitioner served copy of this Order via U.S. Mail Service)(Attorney General served copy of this Order, First Amended Petition, Consent to MJ form, and Intent to Proceed DJ form via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
March 6, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying in Forma Pauperis Application (ECF No. 4 ) and (2) Granting Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 3 ). Petitioner must satisfy the filing fee requirement by paying the fee or providing adequate proof of his inability to pay, no later than 04/30/2018. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 03/06/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowan v. Gastelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Jeffrey Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Josie Gastelo
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?