Appel et al v. Concierge Auctions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Howard Appel and David Cohen
Defendant: Concierge Auctions, LLC, Chad Roffers, Alexander Gray, Emily Pryor, Katie McMains, Serena Irwin and Olivia Asavei
Case Number: 3:2017cv02263
Filed: November 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 74 Motion Confirm Arbitration Award. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/1/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(bdc)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order: (1) Denying Defendants Motion To Continue (ECF No. 69 );(2) Denying Plaintiffs Motion To Vacate In Part The Arbitration Award (ECF No. 63 ); and (3) Denying Plaintiffs Motion For Sanctions (ECF No. 64 ). The Court ORDERS Defendant to file a motion to confirm the arbitration award within fourteen days of this order on or before June 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 05/20/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order Denying Plaintiffs Motion to Lift Stay and Reconsider Order Compelling Arbitration 53 . Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/2/2022. (zda)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying Defendant Concierge Auctions, LLC's 37 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Setting Arbitral Location. Court finds this Motion suitable for determination on the papers and without oral argument. Court denies Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. The Parties are to proceed to arbitration as per Court's prior Orders 30 , 36 . The case remains stayed and administratively closed. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/12/2018. (jah)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting in part Defendant Concierge Auctions, LLC's 10 Motion to Compel Arbitration; denying Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Court stays this action as to all parties and all claims. Court orders the parties to proceed arbitration for a determination of arbitrability and possible arbitration of Plaintiffs' claims in an manner provided in the Bidder Agreement. Court directs the Clerk to administratively close this action. The decision to administratively close this action pending resolution of the arbitration does not have any jurisdictional effect. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/13/2018. (jah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Appel et al v. Concierge Auctions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Appel
Represented By: Jason Kyle Boss
Represented By: Joseph M. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cohen
Represented By: Jason Kyle Boss
Represented By: Joseph M. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concierge Auctions, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Capobianco
Represented By: Derek Owen Wallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Roffers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie McMains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serena Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia Asavei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?