Rodriguez v. Bumble Bee Foods, LLC

Plaintiff: Miguel Rodriguez
Defendant: Bumble Bee Foods, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv02447
Filed: December 6, 2017
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. The Court finds the proposed settlement of this class action appropriate for final approval pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(e). The Court finds that the proposed settlement appears to be the product of serious, i nformed, arms-length negotiations, that the settlement was entered into in good faith, and that Plaintiff has satisfied the standards for final approval of a class action settlement under federal law. Further, the Court finds attorneys' fees in the amount of $34,801.00, costs in the amount of $933.00, and a class representative award in the amount of $1,500.00 to be reasonable. The Court approves the Settlement and orders the parties to implement the Settlement Agreement according to its terms and conditions and this Court's Final Order.(rmc)
April 20, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice and ORDER Providing Tentative Rulings re: 17 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; and 18 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Incentive Award. The Court tentatively grants Plaintiff's Motion for Final Ap proval of Class Action Settlement. The Court tentatively grants in part Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Incentive Award. The Court tentatively finds attorneys' fees in the amount of $34,801.00 to be reasonable. The Court tentatively finds costs in the amount of $933.00 to be reasonable. Finally, the Court tentatively finds a class representative incentive award in the amount of $1,500 to be reasonable. As these rulings are tentative, the Court looks forward to the arguments of counsel at the hearing. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/20/2018.(rmc)
March 1, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 13 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. The Final Approval Hearing will be held before Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/23/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3D, to consider the fairness, adeq uacy, and reasonableness of the proposed Settlement preliminarily approved by this Order of Preliminary Approval, and to consider the application of Class Counsel for an award of reasonable attorneys' fees, litigation expenses, and a class representative incentive award. Accordingly, the Court vacates the previously scheduled 3/12/2018 hearing. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/1/2018. (rmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Bumble Bee Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Rodriguez
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Trevor Flynn
Represented By: Melanie Rae Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bumble Bee Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?