Knox v. US Customs and Border Patrol et al

Plaintiff: Peggy Ruth Knox
Defendant: US Customs and Border Patrol and Micah Bennett
Case Number: 3:2018cv00030
Filed: January 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Referring Judge: Andrew G. Schopler
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. The Court DISMISSES Knox's fourth amended complaint with prejudice. Despite giving Knox several chances to amend, the Court simply does not see a way for Knox to allege any new facts not previously stated which would waive the United States' sovereign immunity. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/3/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Motion to File IFP and Dismissing the Case without Prejudice. The Court DENIES as moot Knox's IFP motion, (Doc. No. 2), and DISMISSES Knox's SAC with leave to amend, (Doc. No. 9, 11). Knox must file her third amended complaint as a stand-alone document by 6/22/2018. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/29/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying as moot 2 Plaintiff's Motion to File IFP and Dismissing the Case Without Prejudice. Knox must file her second amended complaint by 3/16/2018. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/7/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. US Customs and Border Patrol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Ruth Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Customs and Border Patrol
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micah Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?