Asper v. Wells Fargo Bank et al

Plaintiff: Laith KH Asper
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank and DOES 1 - 20
Case Number: 3:2018cv00049
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Jill L. Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 24 Defendant Wells Fargo Bank's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Defendant's unopposed motion and dismisses Plaintiff's FAC without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/14/2018. (rmc)
May 18, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part 6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants in part Defendant's motion to dismiss, and dismisses Plaintiff's FCBA claim with leave to amend. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint that cures the defici encies identified herein on or before 6/8/2018. The Court defers ruling on the sufficiency of Plaintiff's state law claims until Plaintiff can state a claim arising under federal law, or demonstrate that the Court has diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/17/2018. (rmc)
February 16, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 11 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court finds that Plaintiff's pending motion for a TRO does not establish that he is entitled to injunctive relief. Accordingly, the Court denies Plaintiff's ex parte motion for a TRO. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/16/2018. (rmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asper v. Wells Fargo Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laith KH Asper
Represented By: Francisco J Aldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: David Michael Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?